FL H1033 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for former justice or judge to be qualified to serve as retired justice or judge under certain conditions; provides circumstances under which such justice or judge may not serve as retired justice or judge; exempts retired judges consenting to temporary duty from certain termination & reemployment limitations.
Title
Retirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 209 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 90 | |
2011-02-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0428 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
121 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
25 | 073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1033 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1033/BillText/Filed/HTML |