FL H1021 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes law enforcement agencies to assist hospitals in identifying certain patients; requires such agencies to provide hospitals with certain information; authorizes clinical social workers to make certain decisions & applications for patient's continued care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Patient Identification and Health Care Decisions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-07HouseNow in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
2022-01-07HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2022-01-07HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-07HouseReferred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2022-01-07HouseReferred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
2021-12-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1392 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3951013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
765401Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback