FL H1021 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows DHSMV to share driver license photographs with AHCA pursuant to interagency agreement; adds additional disqualifying offenses to screening provisions; revises information to be submitted for background screening; revises terminology; requires that individuals seeking exemption from disqualification must have completed all nonmonetary conditions; requires persons seeking exemption from disqualification to pay any monetary penalty in full before being eligible to apply; requires that photograph of applicant taken at time fingerprints are processed be submitted to Care Provider Background Screening Clearinghouse before submission of electronic fingerprints; requires specified information to be included with initiation of screening registration within clearinghouse.
Title
Background Screening
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#291 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Received |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Transportation; Criminal Justice |
2013-04-26 | Senate | In Messages |
2013-04-26 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-25 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-23 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/13 |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-04-18 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/18/13, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2013-04-12 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-04-12 | House | CS referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-04-12 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Committee |
2013-04-11 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2013-04-11 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-04-09 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/09/13, 2:30 pm, 404 HOB |
2013-03-25 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-22 | House | CS by Health Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-03-22 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-19 | House | CS by Health Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Innovation Subcommittee, 03/19/13, 2:00 pm, 306 HOB |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1112 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Transportation
S0966 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1071 (Ch. 2013-93), CS/CS/HB 1159 (Ch. 2013-153), SB 1520 (Ch. 2013-48)
S0966 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1071 (Ch. 2013-93), CS/CS/HB 1159 (Ch. 2013-153), SB 1520 (Ch. 2013-48)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
322 | 142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 809 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
435 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
435 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
435 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |