FL H1021 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits state agency from deducting from employee wages dues, uniform assessments, fines, penalties, or special assessments of employee organization or contributions made for purposes of political activity; prohibits county, municipality, or other local governmental entity from deducting from employee wages dues, uniform assessments, fines, penalties, or special assessments of employee organization or contributions made for purposes of political activity, etc.
Title
Labor and Employment
Sponsors
Rep. Rachel Burgin [R] | Rep. Chris Dorworth [R] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R] | Sen. Gayle Harrell [R] |
House State Affairs Committee | Rep. John Tobia [R] | Rep. Charles Van Zant [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#86 (Y: 73 N: 40 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#85 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#85 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-26 | Received -SJ 506 | |
2011-03-29 | In Messages | |
2011-03-25 | Read 3rd time -HJ 318 | |
2011-03-24 | Read 2nd time -HJ 289 | |
2011-03-22 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/24/11 | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 10 -HJ 266 | |
2011-03-17 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/21/11, 12:30 pm, Webster Hall | |
2011-03-14 | Now in Appropriations Committee -HJ 219 | |
2011-03-11 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-03-10 | CS by State Affairs Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 6 -HJ 216 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 89 | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to State Affairs Committee; Appropriations Committee -HJ 89 | |
2011-02-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0830 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 507 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |