FL H1015 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises procedures to be used by taxing authorities before & after adopting final millage rate & budget.
Title
Millage Rates
Sponsors
House Local and Federal Affairs Committee | House Local Government Affairs Subcommittee | Rep. Jeanette Nunez [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died on Calendar |
2016-02-29 | House | CS/CS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2016-02-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-26 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-25 | House | CS/CS by- Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-23 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 02/25/16, 10:00 am, Webster Hall |
2016-02-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 02/09/16, 11:30 am, Webster Hall --Temporarily postponed |
2016-02-03 | House | Now in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | CS by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-02-02 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-01 | House | CS by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 4 |
2016-01-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, 02/01/16, 11:30 am, Webster Hall |
2016-01-21 | House | Now in Local Government Affairs Subcommittee |
2016-01-21 | House | Favorable by Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 01/21/16, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-08 | House | Referred to Finance and Tax Committee; Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-12-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1222 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations