FL H1013 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-99
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides legislative intent regarding State of Florida & its political subdivisions observing daylight saving time year-round under certain conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Daylight Saving Time

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#588 (Y: 102 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27 Chapter No. 2018-99
2018-03-23 Approved by Governor
2018-03-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-06HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-06SenatePassed; YEAS 33 NAYS 2
2018-03-06SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-05SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 858
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-05SenateWithdrawn from Community Affairs; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2018-02-21SenateReceived
2018-02-20SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2018-02-20SenateIn Messages
2018-02-14HousePassed; YEAS 103 NAYS 11
2018-02-14HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-14HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18
2018-02-01HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-01HouseFavorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-01-30HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/01/18, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2018-01-24HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-01-24HouseFavorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-01-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 01/24/18, 8:30 am, 12 HOB
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-03HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-12-15HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S858 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 1013

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback