FL H1013 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises process for establishing schedules of maximum reimbursement allowances; provides that adoption of schedules of maximum reimbursement allowances is subject to administrative proceedings & judicial review.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maximum Reimbursement Allowances for Workers' Compensation Medical Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Regulatory Affairs Committee
2015-03-20HouseNow in Regulatory Affairs Committee
2015-03-19HouseCS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-03-19HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-18HouseCS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1
2015-03-16HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/18/15, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2015-03-11HouseNow in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
2015-03-11HouseFavorable by Rulemaking Oversight and Repeal Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2015-03-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Rulemaking Oversight and Repeal Subcommittee, 03/11/15, 10:00 am, 306 HOB
2015-03-03HouseReferred to Rulemaking Oversight and Repeal Subcommittee; Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1060 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12080Amended CodeSee Bill Text
44013Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback