FL H1011 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-13 - Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda
Pending: House Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Task Force on Monitoring of Children in Out-of-Home Care; provides for membership; requires task force to convene by specified date; authorizes task force to conduct meetings through teleconference or other electronic means; provides duties of task force; requires Florida Institute for Child Welfare to conduct focus groups & submit its findings to task force; requires DCF to submit certain monthly reports to task force; requires task force to submit report to Governor & Legislature; provides for repeal of task force.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force on the Monitoring of Children in Out-of-Home Care

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-13HouseAdded to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-07HouseNow in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
2022-01-07HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2022-01-07HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-07HouseReferred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
2021-12-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1358 (Similar To) 2022-01-12 - Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
394093Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback