FL H1011 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revises provisions of city charter relating to ethics; provides declaration of ethics policy; authorizes establishment of ethics code & ethics commission; provides duties of ethics commission; requires ethics code to include citywide ethics oversight & compliance office; provides administrative support for commission & office; requires certain elected officials to complete certain ethics training; repeals provision relating to ethics education & application of ethics laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of Jacksonville, Duval County

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 88
2011-03-03 Referred to Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 88
2011-02-25 Filed

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback