FL H0987 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Local Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Local Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Broward County Affordable Housing Improvement Act; authorizes levy of discretionary surtax to establish & finance affordable housing; requires OPPAGA to review the discretionary surtax program at a specified interval & provide a report to the Governor & Legislature.
Title
Broward County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Local Administration Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Local Administration Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-12-18 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/987 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/987/BillText/Filed/PDF |