FL H0987 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises criteria used by counties & municipalities in evaluating disposal of real property; revises reporting requirements for specified entities relating to impact fees; provides requirements for certain agreements with Florida Housing Development Corporation; provides local permit approval process; revises criteria used by review committee when selecting applications for state apartment incentive loans; provides process for certain entities to dispose of certain surplus lands; revises procedures under which BOT, DOT, & WMDs must dispose of nonconservation surplus lands; creates Hurricane Housing Recovery Program for certain affordable housing recovery purposes; requires corporation to administer program; specifies requirements for receiving & using funds; requires participating local governments to submit report; creates Rental Recovery Loan Program to provide funds for additional rental housing due to specified impacts; authorizes corporation to adopt emergency rules.
Title
Affordable Housing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#720 (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2018-03-01 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-03-01 | House | CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 1 |
2018-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time 758 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-02-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-22 | House | CS/CS/CS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time |
2018-02-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18 |
2018-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-22 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-22 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/22/18, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2018-02-19 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | CS/CS by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-02-14 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-13 | House | CS/CS by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1 |
2018-02-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/13/18, 12:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2018-01-17 | House | CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-01-17 | House | Now in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2018-01-16 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-01-16 | House | CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 01/16/18, 11:30 am, 12 HOB |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-20 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-12-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1328 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 379 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 31801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 0451 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
253 | 0341 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
337 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 089 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 0007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 507 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 5087 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 57 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 58 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 9071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |