FL H0985 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals provisions relating to peddling at or within specified distance of any camp or field meeting held for religious purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Peddling at Camp Meetings [CPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0014 - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - House - House Roll Call No. 0576 - Passage (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-11 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-63
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-23 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01032
2010-04-22 Read 3rd time -SJ 00726; Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 -SJ 00726
2010-04-21 Withdrawn from Commerce; Criminal Justice -SJ 00676; Substituted for SB 2128 -SJ 00677; Read 2nd time -SJ 00677
2010-04-20 Received -SJ 00656
2010-04-19 Referred to Commerce; Criminal Justice -SJ 00656
2010-03-23 In Messages
2010-03-18 Read 3rd time -HJ 00316; Passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 0 -HJ 00316
2010-03-16 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00283
2010-03-09 Favorable by- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 00259; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00259
2010-03-05 On Council agenda-- Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council, 03/09/10, 11:00 am, 404-H
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council -HJ 00088
2010-02-25 Referred to Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council
2010-02-09 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S2128 (Similar To) 2010-04-21 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00677; Substituted HB 985 -SJ 00677; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 985 (Ch. 2010-63) -SJ 00677

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
087103Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback