FL H0983 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to honor limits of federal power as enshrined by U.S. Constitution.
Title
Limitation of Federal Powers Relating to Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Education Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-08 | House | Referred to Education Committee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-12-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1384 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/983 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0983/BillText/Filed/PDF |