FL H0981 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes specified local governments to levy non-ad valorem assessments to recover costs for elimination of chronic nuisances on real property; provides for payment & collection of assessments.
Title
Chronic Nuisance Service Assessments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 96 | |
2011-12-21 | Referred to Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 96 | |
2011-12-09 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/981 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0981/BillText/Filed/PDF |