FL H0979 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires pet dealers to only sell or offer for sale dogs procured from humane society, animal shelter, or person or entity who has not been adjudicated and issued certain citations for violating federal Animal Welfare Act; prohibits unlicensed commercial dog breeder from selling dog to pet dealer; requires pet dealer to retain certain records for specified period after sale; provides penalties.
Title
Pet Dealers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Careers and Competition Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1466 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Agriculture
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/979 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0979/BillText/Filed/PDF |