FL H0979 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-11-2)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-214
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-11-2)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-214
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises legislative findings; requires DEO to provide training & technical assistance to certain designated lead agencies of homeless assistance continuums of care; requires that provision of such training & assistance be delegated to certain nonprofit entities; requires department to establish award levels for "Challenge Grants"; specifies criteria to determine award levels; requires department, after consultation with Council on Homelessness, to specify grant award level in notice of solicitation of grant applications; revises qualifications for grant; specifies authorized uses of grant funds; requires lead agency that receives grant to submit report to department; provides for contingent effect.
Title
Homelessness
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#22 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#779 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#779 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Chapter No. 2014-214 | |
2014-06-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-13 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-05-01 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2014-05-01 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 0 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Amendment(s) reconsidered, withdrawn (540440) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (540440) |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1090 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Received |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations |
2014-04-28 | Senate | In Messages |
2014-04-28 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-25 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-23 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/14 |
2014-04-21 | House | Referred to- Calendar |
2014-04-21 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Economic Affairs Committee |
2014-04-11 | House | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time |
2014-04-11 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-04-10 | House | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 26 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 04/10/14, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2014-03-28 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | CS by Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-26 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-25 | House | CS by Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee, 03/25/14, 9:00 am, 12 HOB |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-28 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2014-02-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1090 (Same As) 2014-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 979 (Ch. 2014-214)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
420 | 606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 622 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 9073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |