FL H0977 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires governmental & statutorily created entities to maintain their financial data in accordance with requirements of CFO; requires CFO to adopt charts of accounts & related procedures; requires charts of accounts to be reviewed & updated; requires CFO to adopt certain procedures relating to charts of accounts; provides declaration of state interest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chief Financial Officer

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 85
2011-03-03 Referred to Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee -HJ 85
2011-02-23 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0975 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S1292 () 2011-05-07 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1848
S1276 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback