FL H0975 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1097
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1097
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for appointment of commissioners of the Pasco County Housing Authority; provides exception to general law.
Title
Pasco County Housing Authority, Pasco County
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Nehr [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#24 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#945 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#945 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1097 | |
2012-03-05 | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 -SJ 802 | |
2012-03-05 | Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 799 | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Rules -SJ 761 | |
2012-03-01 | Received -SJ 761 | |
2012-02-29 | In Messages | |
2012-02-29 | Passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 -HJ 925 | |
2012-02-29 | Read 3rd time -HJ 924 | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-28 | Read 2nd time -HJ 873 | |
2012-02-24 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/12 | |
2012-01-20 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 248 | |
2012-01-19 | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 248 | |
2012-01-17 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 01/19/12, 8:30 am, Reed Hall | |
2012-01-12 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 219 | |
2012-01-11 | Favorable by Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 219 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 95 | |
2012-01-09 | On Committee agenda-- Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee, 01/11/12, 11:30 am, Webster Hall | |
2011-12-21 | Referred to Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 95 | |
2011-12-08 | Filed |