FL H0971 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits municipality or private company from charging for garbage pick-up services that are not rendered within specified period; requires municipality or private company to issue a credit or refund on next regular bill; requires payment of a fine if a credit or refund is not issued within specified period.
Title
Interruption of Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died on Calendar |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-03-02 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2018-02-27 | House | CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18 |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-27 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-26 | House | CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 11 |
2018-02-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/26/18, 2:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2018-02-05 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | CS by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-02-01 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-01-29 | House | CS by Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 3 |
2018-01-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 01/29/18, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2018-01-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Energy and Utilities Subcommittee, 01/24/18, 8:00 am, Webster Hall -- Workshopped |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-20 | House | Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2017-12-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1368 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
180 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
364 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
610 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |