FL H0963 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Redesignates "Florida Arbitration Code" as "Revised Florida Arbitration Code"; creates & revises numerous provisions; provides for applicability of revised code; provides that code does not apply to any dispute involving child custody, visitation, or child support; deletes arbitration from voluntary trial resolution provisions; revises provisions relating to procedures in voluntary trial resolution; provides limits on jurisdiction of trial resolution judge.
Title
Dispute Resolution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1050 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Judiciary | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget | |
2012-03-05 | In Messages -SJ 823 | |
2012-03-05 | CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 -HJ 1072 | |
2012-03-05 | Read 3rd time -HJ 1071 | |
2012-03-02 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-02 | Read 2nd time -HJ 1018 | |
2012-03-01 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/12 | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 907 | |
2012-02-27 | CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time -HJ 849 | |
2012-02-27 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-24 | CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 855 | |
2012-02-23 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/24/12, 8:00 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-02-14 | Now in Judiciary Committee -HJ 602 | |
2012-02-14 | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 5 -HJ 602 | |
2012-02-10 | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/14/12, 8:30 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-18 | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee -HJ 238 | |
2012-01-18 | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 238 | |
2012-01-13 | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 01/18/12, 8:30 am, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 94 | |
2011-12-21 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 95 | |
2011-12-08 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
44 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 1926 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 1402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
682 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
682 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
682 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
682 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
682 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
682 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
682 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
682 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
682 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
682 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
682 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
682 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
682 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
682 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
682 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
682 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
682 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
682 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
682 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
682 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
682 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
682 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
731 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |