FL H0961 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Chapter No. 2015-176
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes sender to post certain documents to secure electronic site with recipient approval; provides instructions for effectuating such approval; specifies when documents & messages sent electronically are deemed received; specifies how authorization of electronic receipt of documents are made; requires sender to provide notice of beginning of limitations period; establishes burdens of proof for determining whether proper notifications were provided; specifies that electronic messages are deemed received when sent; specifies that service of certain documents are governed by Florida Rules of Civil Procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic Noticing of Trust Accounts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#50 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#153 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-17 Chapter No. 2015-176
2015-06-16 Approved by Governor
2015-06-01 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-23HouseOrdered enrolled
2015-04-23SenateCS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2015-04-23SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-22SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-22SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-22SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 1314
2015-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-22SenateWithdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules
2015-04-21SenateReceived
2015-04-21SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules
2015-04-21SenateIn Messages
2015-04-16HouseCS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 0
2015-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-15HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-15HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-13HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/15/15
2015-03-26HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-03-26HouseFavorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2015-03-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/26/15, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2015-03-13HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2015-03-12HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2015-03-12HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2015-03-11HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2015-03-09HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/11/15, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2015-03-03HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-24HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1314 (Similar To) 2015-04-22 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 961 (Ch. 2015-176)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7360109Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback