FL H0949 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises requirements for dependent child to be appointed an attorney; requires that court appoint substitute counsel if attorney withdraws or is discharged by court; provides that all appointed attorneys & organizations are entitled to funding for litigation costs; requires appointed attorneys to report certain information; requires JAC to contract with nonprofit entity to establish Quality Counsel Program; requires quality improvement program; requires annual report; requires Quality Counsel Program to be established & fully operational by specified date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Attorneys for Dependent Children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11HouseDied in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2016-02-04HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2016-02-03HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2016-02-03HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2016-02-01HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2016-01-28HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 02/01/16, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2016-01-12HouseIntroduced
2016-01-08HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2015-12-14HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1212 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
27406Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3901305Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback