FL H0945 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-107
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires DCF & AHCA to identify children & adolescents who use crisis stabilization services & to meet behavioral health needs of such children & adolescents; requires development of plans promoting coordinated system of care for certain services; requires testing of provider network databases maintained by Medicaid managed care plans; requires verification of use of certain strategies & outreach before student is removed from school, school transportation, or school-sponsored activity under specified circumstances; provides exception; requires DCF & AHCA to assess quality of care provided in crisis stabilization units.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children's Mental Health

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#569 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29 Chapter No. 2020-107
2020-06-27 Approved by Governor
2020-06-17 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-12HouseOrdered enrolled
2020-03-12SenateCS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2020-03-12SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-11SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-11SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-11SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 1440
2020-03-11SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-11SenateWithdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2020-03-06SenateReceived
2020-03-06SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2020-03-06SenateIn Messages
2020-03-06HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 110 NAYS 0
2020-03-06HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-05HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-05HouseAmendment(s) adopted (396855)
2020-03-05HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-02HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20
2020-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-27HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2020-02-27HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-26HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2020-02-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-02-04HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2020-02-04HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2020-01-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2020-01-21HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-01-17HouseCS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-17HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-01-16HouseCS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 01/16/20, 9:00 am, 12 HOB
2020-01-03HouseReferred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-12-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1440 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 945
H7065 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
H1083 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100444Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100604Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394461Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394493Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394495Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944955Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3949082Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409967Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409988Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985601Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback