FL H0929 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises definition of "salary"; provides definition does not include certain persons in a collective bargaining agreement; provides for retroactive restoration of benefit accrual rate to 3 percent for all years of member's service within specified time period; provides eligible members receive lump-sum payment for accumulated leave payable upon retirement.
Title
City of West Palm Beach, Palm Beach County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#24 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#643 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#643 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-05-03 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-10 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-10 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Local Calendar, 03/10/22 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Received |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2022-03-02 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0 |
2022-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-01 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022) |
2022-02-21 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2022-02-08 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported out of Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-02-04 | House | Added to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-25 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Favorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-21 | House | Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-07 | House | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-12-15 | House | Filed |