FL H0929 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that clerk of court shall provide certain documents to person pursuing restoration of voting rights without charge or delay.
Title
Certified Copy of Documents Required for Restoration of Voting Rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-22 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1258 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
98 | 0751 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/929 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/929/BillText/Filed/PDF |