FL H0927 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-19 - Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Designates boundaries of entertainment district within downtown area of city; authorizes DBPR to issue special licenses or modify existing licensees for bona fide licensees operating validly licensed premises within such entertainment district for sale of alcoholic beverages for consumption off premises; provides special licenses or modifications of existing licenses are in addition to other authorized temporary permits; requires bona fide licensees to comply with all other statutory requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Downtown Crystal River Entertainment District, Citrus County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-19 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-19HouseNow in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2022-01-19HouseReported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2022-01-19HouseFavorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2022-01-14HouseAdded to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-07HouseNow in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2022-01-07HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2022-01-07HouseReferred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2022-01-07HouseReferred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-12-15HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback