FL H0927 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts records containing identifying data of either respondent, petitioner, or recipient of firearms relinquished pursuant provisions relating to injunctions against domestic violence, stalking, or cyberstalking; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemptions; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./Records Concerning Firearms Relinquished Pursuant to Protective Injunctions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-08 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-12-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0925 (Related) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S1408 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice
S1410 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice
S1408 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice
S1410 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/927 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0927/BillText/Filed/PDF |