FL H0927 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Chapter No. 2015-154
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Chapter No. 2015-154
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revising procedures and requirements relating to the recovery of assessments from title insurers through surcharges assessed on policies; revising requirements for the payment of excess surcharges to the Insurance Regulatory Trust Fund; authorizing the Financial Services Commission and the Department of Financial Services to adopt rules for certain purposes, etc.
Title
Title Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#364 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#34 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#162 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#34 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#162 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Chapter No. 2015-154 | |
2015-06-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-24 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2015-04-24 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 107 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-24 | House | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (366320) |
2015-04-24 | House | In returning messages |
2015-04-24 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (366320) |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1136 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2015-04-21 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-04-16 | House | CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/15/15 |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-04-01 | House | Favorable by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/01/15, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-24 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-03-24 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-20 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/24/15, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2015-03-12 | House | Now in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee |
2015-03-11 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2015-03-11 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-10 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/10/15, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1136 (Same As) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 927 (Ch. 2015-154)