FL H0925 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides definition of "charter school employee"; provides financial disclosure requirements for charter school employees.
Title
Disclosure of Financial Interests
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-13 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; Education Committee |
2017-12-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1266 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/925 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/925/BillText/Filed/PDF |