FL H0921 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates sum annually for identified period of time from Land Acquisition Trust Fund to specified area of critical state concern for specified purposes; provides additional principles for guiding development within Apalachicola Area of Critical State Concern to include projects that protect & improve water quality.
Title
Apalachicola Stewardship
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1256 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
375 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 0555 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/921 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/921/BillText/Filed/PDF |