FL H0913 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1244
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1244
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates statutes of limitations periods for prosecution of specified violations relating to sexual performance by child if offender was certain age at time of offense.
Title
Statutes of Limitation for Offenses Relating to Sexual Performance by a Child
Sponsors
House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Subcommittee | Sen. Tracie Davis [D] | Rep. Dotie Joseph [D] | Rep. Joseph Casello [D] |
Rep. Angela Nixon [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1244 |
2022-03-03 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-03-03 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022) |
2022-02-23 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-23 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2022-02-23 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Favorable by Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2022-02-15 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-15 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | Original reference removed: Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-15 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-15 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-02-15 | House | Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-02-11 | House | PCS added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-03 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2022-01-03 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-03 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-03 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-12-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1244 (Same As) 2022-06-08 - Chapter No. 2022-170
S878 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
S692 (Similar To) 2022-06-06 - Chapter No. 2022-165
S878 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
S692 (Similar To) 2022-06-06 - Chapter No. 2022-165