FL H0913 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes program within DEP; provides for program purpose & participants; requires program to submit Florida Resiliency Plan to Governor & Legislature at specified intervals; provides plan requirements; directs DEP to coordinate & oversee program & provide staff support.
Title
Florida Climate and Resiliency Research Program
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Diamond [D] | Rep. Holly Raschein [R] | Rep. Anna Eskamani [D] | Rep. Javier Fernandez [D] |
Rep. Dotie Joseph [D] | Sen. Tina Polsky [D] | Rep. Jennifer Webb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-12 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-12-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1232 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/913 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/913/BillText/Filed/PDF |