FL H0907 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Includes representative of Port Putnam as member of Florida Seaport Transportation & Economic Development Council; authorizes Putnam County to apply for grant through council for feasibility study regarding establishment of port; provides for evaluation of application; requires DOT to include study in its budget request; terminates membership of Port Putnam on council under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Seaport Transportation and Economic Development Council

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-03HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2022-01-03HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2022-01-03HouseReferred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-03HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-12-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1038 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/24/22, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Building

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1633178Amended CodeSee Bill Text
189068Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31107Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31109Amended CodeSee Bill Text
311091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31110Amended CodeSee Bill Text
311101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
311121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31518Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32020Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33427Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33714Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373406Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3734133Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3734136Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403061Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback