FL H0907 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DOE to incorporate training in youth suicide awareness & prevention into certain instructional personnel continuing education or inservice training requirements & to develop list of approved materials for training; provides that no cause of action results from implementation of act.
Title
Youth Suicide Awareness and Prevention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Education Appropriations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237) |
2016-01-29 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/02/16, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall --Temporarily postponed |
2016-01-26 | House | Now in Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2016-01-26 | House | Favorable by K-12 Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- K-12 Subcommittee, 01/26/16, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-08 | House | Referred to K-12 Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2015-12-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0884 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
S1166 (Similar To) 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 837 (Ch. 2016-137), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
H7029 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-237, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 837 (Ch. 2016-137), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62)
S1166 (Similar To) 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 837 (Ch. 2016-137), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
H7029 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-237, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 837 (Ch. 2016-137), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/907 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0907/BillText/Filed/PDF |