FL H0907 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Finance and Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Senate & House of Representatives to appoint Joint Legislative Review Committee to oversee review of exemptions from tax on sales, use, & other transactions & make recommendations regarding review; provides responsibilities of Joint Legislative Review Committee for purpose of reviewing exemptions from general state sales & use tax & exclusions of sales of services from such taxation; provides for meetings & governance by joint rules; specifies powers & duties; provides for reports; requires continuing periodic review of sales tax exemptions & exclusions; provides for future elimination of all sales, rental, use, consumption, distribution, & storage tax exemptions under section except those for general groceries, medical, guide dogs for blind, hospital meals & rooms, household fuels, meals delivered by nonprofit volunteer organizations as charitable function, & certain books, lunches, & publications used or provided at schools for students grades K through 12.
Title
Review of Exemptions and Exclusions from the Tax on Sales, Use, and Other Transactions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Finance and Tax Committee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 88 | |
2011-12-21 | Referred to Finance and Tax Committee; Appropriations Committee; Rules and Calendar Committee -HJ 88 | |
2011-12-06 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
212 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0598 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 0821 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 096 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 097 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 098 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/907 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0907/BillText/Filed/HTML |