FL H0905 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts the sales & use tax from the sale of electric & hydrogen vehicles until specified date.
Title
An Exemption from Sales & Use Tax for Electrical & Hydrogen Vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. John Cortes [D] | Sen. Lori Berman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Finance and Tax Committee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0864 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/905 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0905/BillText/Filed/PDF |