FL H0903 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that Chief Inspector General is responsible for all agency inspectors general, including cabinet agencies & EOG; houses office of Chief Inspector General in EOG for administrative purposes only; provides that Chief Inspector General reports to Cabinet; revises definitions; provides responsibilities & duties for Chief Inspector General & agency inspectors general; directs DMS to adopt criteria for use of purchasing cards; requires agency inspector general to conduct periodic audits of use of such cards.
Title
Inspectors General
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 77 | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 78 | |
2011-02-22 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1280 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 3187 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3189 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 31895 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 31901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 2015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/903 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0903/BillText/Filed/HTML |