FL H0899 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires managed care plans to collect & report certain measures for specified categories beginning with specified data reporting periods; requires managed care plans to stratify reported measures by specified categories for specified data reporting periods; requires managed care plans to publish performance on such measures on their websites; requires AHCA to use such measures to monitor plan performance.
Title
Managed Care Plan Performance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#153 (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Finance & Facilities Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Finance & Facilities Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-04-15 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-04-15 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-15 | House | Immediately certified |
2021-04-15 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 1 |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-08 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/15/2021) |
2021-04-06 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-04-02 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2021-03-29 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Original reference removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-25 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-25 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-25 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported out of Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable with CS by Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Added to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-22 | House | Now in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1272 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Health Policy