FL H0899 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides factors court must consider when determining whether child should remain in his or her current placement or be placed in out-of-home care; provides requirements for case plans & permanency determinations; requires disclosure & determination of ineffective communication by parents & caregivers; provides for agency & caregiver recommendations for change in visitation; provides factors court must consider when determining whether child should be returned to custody of his or her parents; authorizes lead agency to provide more than 35 percent of all child welfare services under certain conditions.
Title
Child Welfare
Sponsors
House Health and Human Services Committee | House Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee | Rep. Josie Tomkow [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#215 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-25 | House | CS passed; YEAS 109 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19 |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-17 | House | CS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2019-04-17 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-04-16 | House | CS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/16/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-04-03 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 29 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-29 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 04/02/19, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2019-03-15 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-15 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-14 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-13 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 03/13/19, 8:30 am, 12 HOB |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-02-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1396 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
322 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 521 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 522 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 6011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 6012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 495 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 988 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 746 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 0851 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
934 | 255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
960 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |