FL H0899 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-174
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-174
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes APD to petition for appointment of receiver for comprehensive transitional education program.
Title
Comprehensive Transitional Education Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#158 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#158 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Chapter No. 2017-174 | |
2017-06-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-06-14 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-05-05 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2017-05-05 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 714 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations |
2017-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-20 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-18 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/19/17 |
2017-04-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/17 |
2017-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-30 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/30/17, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2017-03-17 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-03-17 | House | CS referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-03-17 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-03-14 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-14 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-13 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 03/13/17, 2:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0714 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 899 (Ch. 2017-174)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
393 | 0678 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |