FL H0899 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Joe Carlucci Uniform Firearms Act, to eliminate amendments made to act by ch. 2011-109, LOF, & to restore act as it existed prior to enactment of, ch. 2011-109, LOF, on Oct. 1, 2011; revises provisions that preempt to state entire field of regulation of firearms; provides that preemption does not affect zoning ordinances which encompass firearms businesses along with other businesses; specifies that certain zoning ordinances are in conflict with preemption & are prohibited; reinstates limited exception to such preemption which authorizes county to have option to adopt ordinance that requires waiting period of up to 3 working days between purchase & delivery of handgun; provides requirements & limitations with respect to adoption of waiting-period ordinance; eliminates provisions which prohibit knowing & willful violation of Legislature's occupation of whole field of regulation of firearms & ammunition by enactment or causation of enforcement of any local ordinance or administrative rule or regulation.
Title
Regulation of Firearms and Ammunition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 87 | |
2011-12-21 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 87 | |
2011-12-05 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
790 | 251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/899 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0899/BillText/Filed/HTML |