FL H0895 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain sanctioning bodies to disqualify person from acting as coach for remainder of season if that person is removed from game by official.
Title
Youth Athletic Coaches
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 77 | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 77 | |
2011-02-22 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0748 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/895 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0895/BillText/Filed/HTML |