FL H0889 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-168
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-168
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises retirement pension calculation.
Title
West Palm Beach Police Pension Fund of the City of West Palm Beach, Palm Beach County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#44 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#744 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#744 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Chapter No. 2018-168 | |
2018-03-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2018-03-08 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Local Calendar, 03/08/18 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Received |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2018-03-01 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-02-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18 |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-08 | House | Favorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-06 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/08/18, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2018-01-23 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2018-01-23 | House | Favorable by Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2018-01-10 | House | Now in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee |
2018-01-10 | House | Favorable by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 01/10/18, 3:30 pm, 12 HOB |
2017-12-13 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-12-05 | House | Filed |