FL H0887 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Chapter No. 2015-152
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Chapter No. 2015-152
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for escheatment to state of unclaimed U.S. savings bonds; provides for judicial determination of escheatment; provides procedures for challenging escheatment; provides for deposit of proceeds of escheatment; provides that person claiming a U.S. savings bond may file claim.
Title
Unclaimed Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#28 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#218 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#218 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Chapter No. 2015-152 | |
2015-06-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-27 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Substituted for SB 1138 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Received |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2015-04-22 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15 |
2015-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-04-09 | House | Favorable by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/09/15, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-31 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-03-31 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/31/15, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2015-03-25 | House | Now in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee |
2015-03-25 | House | Favorable by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-23 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/25/15, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1138 (Similar To) 2015-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 887 (Ch. 2015-152)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
717 | 1382 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
717 | 1383 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |