FL H0879 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises definition of "recovered materials" to include certain wood, asphalt, & concrete materials; provides applicability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recovered Materials

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Government Accountability Committee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-05HouseNow in Government Accountability Committee
2018-02-05HouseCS referred to Government Accountability Committee
2018-02-05HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2018-02-02HouseCS by Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-02-01HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-30HouseCS by Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 1
2018-01-26HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 3:30 pm, 12 HOB
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-13HouseReferred to Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-12-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1326 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
403703Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4037071Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback