FL H0873 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to capital outlay funding for charter schools, Special Facility Construction Account relating to receipt of funds, criteria for requests, preapplication review, consultants, & repayment of school district's share of project costs; revises provisions relating to use of certain funds for certain education plant space construction & calculation of total cost per student station; requires DOE to conduct study & provide report; revises eligibility criteria for High Growth District Capital Outlay Assistance Grant Program.
Title
Education Funding
Sponsors
House Education Committee | House Appropriations Committee | Sen. Manny Diaz [R] | Rep. Erik Fresen [R] |
Rep. Ross Spano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237) |
2016-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-22 | House | CS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time |
2016-02-19 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-17 | House | CS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 4 |
2016-02-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/17/16, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2016-02-12 | House | CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time |
2016-02-12 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-10 | House | CS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 5 |
2016-02-05 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/09/16, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2016-01-26 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-26 | House | Favorable by K-12 Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- K-12 Subcommittee, 01/26/16, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-12-18 | House | Referred to K-12 Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Education Committee |
2015-12-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1064 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
S0524 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 287 (Ch. 2016-223), CS/CS/HB 719 (Ch. 2016-58), CS/CS/HB 1365 (Ch. 2016-149), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
H7029 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-237, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 837 (Ch. 2016-137), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62)
S0524 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 287 (Ch. 2016-223), CS/CS/HB 719 (Ch. 2016-58), CS/CS/HB 1365 (Ch. 2016-149), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
H7029 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-237, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 837 (Ch. 2016-137), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1011 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 738 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |