FL H0871 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 914
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 914
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires law enforcement agencies to annually report race & ethnicity data of certain violators to DHSMV; requires motor vehicle operator to display proof of maintenance of security to law enforcement officer; extends date by which DHSMV must implement rebuilt motor vehicle inspection program; adds counties where program is implemented; redefines "apportionable vehicle"; requires licensed mobile home dealers, RV dealers, mobile home manufacturers, & RV manufacturers, distributors, & importers to deliver certain documents to DHSMV within certain timeframe; specifies term of certain garage liability insurance policy; requires numbers assigned to ID cards & driver licenses to have randomly generated digits; requires certain commercial motor vehicles to meet certain federal requirements.
Title
Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | House Infrastructure and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee | Rep. Chuck Brannan [R] | Rep. Christopher Benjamin [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Laid on Table, refer to SB 914 |
2022-03-03 | House | Substituted SB 914 |
2022-02-28 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022) |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-26 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-26 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-25 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2022-02-17 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-02-16 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-16 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-16 | House | Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-16 | House | Favorable with CS by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-14 | House | Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2022-02-03 | House | Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | Reported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | Favorable by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2022-02-01 | House | Added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-16 | House | Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-12-16 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-12-16 | House | Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-16 | House | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee |
2021-12-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S914 (Same As) 2022-06-09 - Chapter No. 2022-175
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 646 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
319 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 77 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 771 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 8225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7415 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |