FL H0871 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires FDLE to post publicly accessible list on its website of persons convicted of specified animal abuse offenses; requires each clerk of court to forward notice of animal abuse conviction to FDLE within specified time; provides requirements for list; specifies period for listing; provides for removal of listing if conviction is expunged or sealed; requires FDLE to send annual notice to specified entities; authorizes probation conditions to prohibition certain persons from having certain responsibilities for or association with animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal Abusers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05HouseDied in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-05-05HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-03-17HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-03-15HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2017-03-15HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-03-15HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2017-03-13HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/15/17, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-03-01HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-02-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1628 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
82812Amended CodeSee Bill Text
828126Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430425Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback