FL H0871 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-15 - Chapter No. 2016-253
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals penalty for exceeding speed limit in specified waterways; repeals requirements for erection of waterway speed limit signs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Broward County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#19 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#734 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-15 Chapter No. 2016-253
2016-03-25 Approved by Governor
2016-03-10 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2016-03-08HouseOrdered enrolled
2016-03-08SenatePassed; YEAS 34 NAYS 0
2016-03-08SenateRead 3rd time
2016-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2016-03-08SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2016-03-04SenatePlaced on Local Calendar, 03/08/16
2016-03-04SenateReceived
2016-03-04SenateReferred to Rules
2016-03-04SenateIn Messages
2016-03-04HousePassed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2016-03-04HouseRead 3rd time
2016-03-04HouseRead 2nd time
2016-03-02HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/16
2016-02-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2016-02-04HouseFavorable by- Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2016-02-02HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 02/04/16, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
2016-01-26HouseNow in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
2016-01-26HouseFavorable by Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2016-01-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee, 01/26/16, 10:00 am, 116 Knott Building
2016-01-14HouseNow in Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee
2016-01-13HouseFavorable by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2016-01-12HouseIntroduced
2016-01-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, 01/13/16, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
2015-12-18HouseReferred to Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee
2015-12-02HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback