FL H0871 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases court cost to fund council.
Title
Pinellas Police Standards Council, Pinellas County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 84 | |
2011-12-21 | Referred to Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 84 | |
2011-12-05 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/871 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0871/BillText/Filed/HTML |